Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Orsini

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592BornCastle of Bracciano, Italy
2 Dec 161523.9Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jan 161624.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
22 Aug 162634.6DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Orsini:
Cardinal Alessandro Orsini (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin

  • a cardinal for 10.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013