Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Agostino Cardinal Orsi, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1692BornFlorence, Italy
24 Sep 175967.4Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175967.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
13 Jun 176169.1DiedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Agostino Orsi:
Cardinal Giuseppe Agostino Orsi O.P. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

  • a cardinal for 1.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013