Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard O’Rourke

Deceased

Bishop of Killala


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Apr 1739SelectedBishop of Killala, Ireland
24 Apr 1739ConfirmedBishop of Killala, Ireland
8 Jul 1743DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Bernard O’Rourke:
Bishop Bernard O’Rourke (died ) Bishop of Killala

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013