Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Orgass

Deceased

Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne]


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Mar 1492AppointedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
1 Apr 1492Ordained BishopBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia
19 Mar 1515DiedBishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne], Estonia

MicroData Summary for Johann Orgass:
Bishop Johann Orgass (died ) Bishop of Ösell (Oesell) [Saare-Lääne]

  • a bishop for 23.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 207
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,419

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013