Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Viviano Cardinal Orfini

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1751Born
10 Mar 182371.5Elevated to Cardinal
8 May 182371.7DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Viviano Orfini
Viviano Cardinal Orfini (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoligno, Italy

  • a cardinal for .1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018