Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1750²Born
17 May 179343.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland
17 May 179343.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Fussala
23 Dec 179848.9SucceededBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
6 Mar 180050.1DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles O’Reilly
Bishop Charles O’Reilly (born 1750, died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Kildrumsheridan

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 221, and Page 248
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 22
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 102, and Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast