Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Orozco de Arce

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Mar 1559AppointedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
2 Jul 1559Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
11 Oct 1561DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francisco Orozco de Arce:
Archbishop Francisco Orozco de Arce (died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 5,512
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 68, Number 397
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 28 Nov 2013