Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius O’Mulalayd, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
22 May 1447AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
30 Jun 1448AppointedBishop of Emly, Ireland
20 Oct 1449AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
1458¹DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cornelius O’Mulalayd
Bishop Cornelius O’Mulalayd O.F.M. (died 1458) Bishop of Elphin

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 131, and Page 167
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast