Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Omodei (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1608Born
19 Feb 165243.1Elevated to Cardinal
12 Mar 165243.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
19 Oct 167667.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
13 Sep 167768.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
8 Jan 168071.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
26 Apr 168576.3DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

MicroData Summary for Luigi Omodei (Sr.)
Luigi Cardinal Omodei (Sr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Carlo al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 33.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast