Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrose O’Madden

Deceased

Bishop of Clonfert, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1641²Born
1666²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 169554.4AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
15 Mar 170766.2AppointedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
28 Aug 171170.6AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
15 Apr 171473.2Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
Jul 1715³74.5DiedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Ambrose O’Madden
Bishop Ambrose O’Madden (born 1641, died Jul 1715) Bishop of Clonfert

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoolegarrane, Co. Galway

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,488
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 162, and Page 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 7
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 24 Aug 2020

Quantcast