Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Olszański

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

Titular Bishop of Serra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1685³BornHorochów
25 Jun 172741.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
25 Jun 172741.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Serra
18 Jan 172842.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Serra
16 May 173852.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Józef Olszański:
Bishop Józef Olszański (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 354
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1728, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015