Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabio Cardinal Olivieri

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1658Born
6 May 171557.0Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 171557.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
9 Feb 173879.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

MicroData Summary for Fabio Olivieri
Fabio Cardinal Olivieri (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePesaro, Italy

  • a cardinal for 22.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 May 1715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast