Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard O’Higgins, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
5 May 1542AppointedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
7 Sep 1542Ordained BishopBishop of Elphin, Ireland
1561²ResignedBishop of Elphin, Ireland
25 Feb 1564DiedBishop Emeritus of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard O’Higgins
Bishop Bernard O’Higgins O.S.A. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Elphin

EventPlace
Death PlaceVila Višosa, Portugal

  • a bishop for 21.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,777
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1542, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 191

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018