Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Patrick O’Healy, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mayo


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1576AppointedBishop of Mayo, Ireland
13 Aug 1579³DiedBishop of Mayo, Ireland
27 Sep 1992Beatified

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Patrick O’Healy:
Bishop Bl. Patrick O’Healy O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Mayo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 232
  • d/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013