Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean Ogé, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Prefect of Liberia, Liberia

Official to Liberia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1868Born
13 Jul 189022.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
3 Jan 191142.8AppointedPrefect of Liberia, Liberia
15 Dec 192759.8AppointedOfficial to Liberia
16 Nov 193163.7DiedPrefect of Liberia, Liberia

MicroData Summary for Jean Ogé
Father Jean Ogé S.M.A. (born , died ) Prefect of Liberia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEttendorf, Archdiocese of Strasbourg, France
Death PlaceLione

  • a priest for 41.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast