Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond O’Gallagher

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1545AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
22 Jun 1569AppointedBishop of Derry, Ireland
15 Mar 1601DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Raymond O’Gallagher
Bishop Raymond O’Gallagher (died ) Bishop of Derry

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 99, and Page 186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 20*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018