Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich von der Pfalz

Deceased

Bishop of Worms, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1487Born
16 Mar 152437.0AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
3 Jan 155264.8DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich von der Pfalz (VIAF: 67402032)
Bishop Heinrich von der Pfalz (born , died ) Bishop of Worms

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeidelberg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018