Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Offredo de Offredi

Deceased

Bishop of Molfetta, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to Venice


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Oct 1596AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
18 May 1598AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
8 Oct 1598AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
Jun 1605³DiedBishop of Molfetta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Offredo de Offredi
Bishop Offredo de Offredi (died Jun 1605) Bishop of Molfetta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 241
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 277
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 8*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018