Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Iwo Odrowąż

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Sep 1218AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
4 Nov 1219AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
13 May 1220ResignedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
21 Jul 1229DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Iwo Odrowąż:
Bishop Iwo Odrowąż (died ) Bishop of Kraków

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 213, and Page 265
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,617

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013