Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony O’Donnell, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Raphoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1675²Born
22 Jun 170429.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jan 175075.0SelectedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
19 Jan 175075.0ConfirmedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland
20 Apr 175580.3DiedBishop of Raphoe, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony O’Donnell
Bishop Anthony O’Donnell O.F.M. (born 1675, died ) Bishop of Raphoe

EventPlace
Buried Place (Original)Abbey, Cemetery, Ballyshannon

  • a priest for 50.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 352
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 38
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast