Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William O’Daly

Deceased

Bishop of Kilfenora, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652²Born
1671²19.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 172270.5SelectedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland
7 Aug 172270.5ConfirmedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland
27 Jul 172674.5DiedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for William O’Daly
Bishop William O’Daly (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Kilfenora

EventPlace
Ordained PriestCloinbar, Co. Galway

  • a priest for 55.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 202
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 41
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast