Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Michael Augustin O’Connor, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Jian’ou [Kienow, Kienning], China


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1938AppointedPrefect of Jian’ou [Kienow, Kienning], China
9 Jan 1941ResignedPrefect of Jian’ou [Kienow, Kienning], China
14 Sep 1957DiedPrefect Emeritus of Jian’ou [Kienow, Kienning], China

MicroData Summary for Michael Augustin O’Connor
Father Michael Augustin O’Connor O.P. (died ) Prefect Emeritus of Jian’ou [Kienow, Kienning]

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast