Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Ochmann, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1405AppointedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
13 Dec 1405Ordained BishopBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia
20 Feb 1418DiedBishop of Reval (Rewel), Estonia

MicroData Summary for Johannes Ochmann
Bishop Johannes Ochmann O.T. (died ) Bishop of Reval (Rewel)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopO.T., Church, Marienburg
Death PlaceReval

  • a bishop for 12.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 420
  • ob: ATh, 27 Mar 2019
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,039

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast