Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas O’Carroll

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1348AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
28 Feb 1364AppointedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland
8 Feb 1373DiedArchbishop of Cashel, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Carroll
Archbishop Thomas O’Carroll (died ) Archbishop of Cashel

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 500, and Page 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 7 Apr 2020

Quantcast