Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni d’Alatri

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua


Events

DateEventTitle
1266¹AppointedBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
19 Dec 1266Ordained BishopBishop of Clonfert, Ireland
2 Oct 1295AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
2 Jan 1301AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
1304¹DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni d’Alatri:
Archbishop Giovanni d’Alatri Archbishop of Capua

  • a bishop for 37.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,258
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,530
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 193, and Page 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013