Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Fernando Ocáriz Braña

Prelate of Opus Dei


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1944 Born
15 Aug 197126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
23 Jan 201772.2AppointedPrelate of Opus Dei

MicroData Summary for Fernando Ocáriz Braña (VIAF: 29663734)
Father Fernando Ocáriz Braña (born ) Prelate of Opus Dei

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France

Please contact the Father through the Personal Prelature of Opus Dei.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Feb 2017