Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastián Obregón, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Titular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Dec 1534AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
2 Dec 1534AppointedTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
1 May 1535Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marocco o Marruecos, Titular Sees
8 Jan 1559DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Sebastián Obregón
Bishop Sebastián Obregón O.S.B. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHeras

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,151
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 46, Number 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 236
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1535, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018