Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Burchard Oberg

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Mar 1557SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
23 Jan 1559ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1567Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
23 Feb 1573DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Burchard Oberg (VIAF: 80324380)
Bishop Burchard Oberg (died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,559
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 210

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast