Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Basilio Oberholzer, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1821Born
1846²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Mar 187553.2AppointedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
28 Nov 189573.9DiedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Basilio Oberholzer
Abbot Basilio Oberholzer O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUznach
Death PlaceEinseideln

  • a priest for 49.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast