Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas O’Beirne

Deceased

Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1685¹Born
12 Jul 173954.5SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
26 Aug 173954.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
26 Aug 173954.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Marmarizana
9 Sep 173954.6SelectedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
16 Sep 173954.7ConfirmedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
Jan 1747³62.0DiedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Beirne
Bishop Thomas O’Beirne (born 1685, died Jan 1747) Bishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEdgeworthstown (Mostrim), Co. Longford
Buried Place (Original)Edgeworthstown (Mostrim), Co. Longford

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 96, and Page 277
  • b: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1739, Number 54
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 26 Aug 2020

Quantcast