Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Franz Neander von Petersheide

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Titular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1626BornNeisse
16 Apr 165023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
26 Jun 166235.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
26 Jun 166235.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
Apr 1663²36.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaterum
5 Feb 169366.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Franz Neander von Petersheide:
Bishop Karl Franz Neander von Petersheide (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014