Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ângelo de Nossa Senhora da Boa-Morte, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1777BornCovilhá
28 Apr 179618.8ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
7 Jun 180022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
17 Dec 183255.5AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
14 Apr 183355.8Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
27 Jul 185275.1DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Ângelo de Nossa Senhora da Boa-Morte
Bishop Ângelo de Nossa Senhora da Boa-Morte O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Bishop of Elvas

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 186
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 6 Aug 2016