Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dobrogost z Nowego Dworu

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1355¹Born
3 Jun 138429.4AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
3 Jun 138429.4Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
26 Jan 139439.0AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
14 Sep 140146.7DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Dobrogost z Nowego Dworu
Archbishop Dobrogost z Nowego Dworu (born 1355, died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNowy Dwór Mazowiecki
Ordained BishopNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceChelm k. Uniejowa

  • a bishop for 17.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 265, and Page 408
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 30 May 2019

Quantcast