Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Novelli

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1514AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
13 May 1521SucceededBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
11 Nov 1530DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Novelli:
Bishop Ippolito Novelli (died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013