Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nuno de Noronha

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
21 May 1586AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
22 Aug 1594AppointedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
27 Nov 1608DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Nuno de Noronha
Bishop Nuno de Noronha (died ) Bishop of Guarda

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 180
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 191
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,586, Number 9*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast