Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Roberto Cardinal de’ Nobili

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1541BornMontepulciano, Italy
22 Dec 155312.3Elevated to Cardinal
6 Feb 155513.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
18 Jan 155917.4DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica

MicroData Summary for Roberto de’ Nobili:
Cardinal Roberto de’ Nobili (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica

  • a cardinal for 5.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1553

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013