Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Patrycy Nidecki

Deceased

Bishop of Wenden (Windau), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1522Born
1573²50.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 158562.4AppointedBishop of Wenden (Windau), Poland
2 Jan 158764.0DiedBishop of Wenden (Windau), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Patrycy Nidecki (VIAF: 25032959)
Bishop Andrzej Patrycy Nidecki (born , died ) Bishop of Wenden (Windau)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOświęcimiu

  • a priest for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 329
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1585, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018