Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William Neubauer, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Minister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

Titular See: (Clement of Milwaukee)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1891BornMilwaukee, WI, USA
7 Jul 191422.9Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Jun 191725.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Apr 194654.6AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 May 195260.8CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
3 Jun 195866.8ElectedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
19 May 196472.7CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Jul 196977.9DiedMinister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

MicroData Summary for William Neubauer:
Father William Neubauer O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Minister General Emeritus of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

  • a priest for 52.0 years

Source(s):
  • mige: AJ, 17 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015