Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Théodore Jean Nersciabuh

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Foreign Archdiocese

Note/Previous Titular See: (Tarso ed Adana) (left the Church)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1843Born
7 Apr 186825.1Ordained BishopArchbishop
10 Jul 187027.4ResignedArchbishop
10 Jul 187027.4Converted
1895¹51.9Died

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Théodore Jean Nersciabuh
Archbishop Théodore Jean Nersciabuh (born , died 1895) Archbishop Emeritus of Foreign Archdiocese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGapan-Maden

  • a bishop for 26.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1886, Page 334
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,397
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Feb 2017