Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Cardinal Negroni

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1710BornRome, Italy
18 Jul 176352.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Aug 176352.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
5 Jun 176554.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
13 Dec 177969.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
17 Jan 178978.2DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

MicroData Summary for Andrea Negroni:
Cardinal Andrea Negroni (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a cardinal for 25.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Jul 1763

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013