Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Negri

Deceased

Bishop of Sapë, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1754¹Born
12 Mar 178026.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 179137.7AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
8 Jul 180854.5AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
13 May 182066.3DiedBishop of Sapë, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Negri
Bishop Marco Negri (born 1754, died ) Bishop of Sapë

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSape

  • a priest for 40.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 349
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 334
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast