Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Nausea

Deceased

Bishop of Wien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1496¹BornWaischenfeld
5 May 153842.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Wien, Austria
19 Mar 153943.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Wien, Austria
21 May 154145.4SucceededBishop of Wien, Austria
Feb 1543³47.1Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
6 Feb 155256.1DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Nausea: VIAF:72190259
Bishop Friedrich Nausea (died ) Bishop of Wien

  • a bishop for 9.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 333
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,918

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014