Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-François de Narbonne-Pelet

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1688BornArles
24 Oct 174557.0SelectedBishop of Lectoure, France
9 Mar 174657.3ConfirmedBishop of Lectoure, France
17 Apr 174657.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lectoure, France
14 May 176071.5DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-François de Narbonne-Pelet: VIAF:296790292
Bishop Claude-François de Narbonne-Pelet (born , died ) Bishop of Lectoure

  • a bishop for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015