Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Baltasar Navarro Arroytia

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577¹Born
28 Jul 163154.5SelectedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
6 Oct 163154.7ConfirmedBishop of Tarazona, Spain
25 Dec 164265.9DiedBishop of Tarazona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar Navarro Arroytia
Bishop Baltasar Navarro Arroytia (born 1577, died ) Bishop of Tarazona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVisiedo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 338
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 155, Number 980
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018