Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paul Peter Myskiw, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)

Titular See: (Protoarchimandrite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1911Born
1933²21.3Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
26 Aug 193423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
195341.3AppointedSuperior General of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
196351.3ResignedSuperior General of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
30 Sep 198473.1DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Peter Myskiw
Father Paul Peter Myskiw O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSlobodnica, Croatia

  • a priest for 50.0 years

Source(s):
  • b/c1: CB, 4 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018