Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Josef Mutschlechner

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1876Born
29 Jun 190023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
13 Oct 192851.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
2 Apr 193053.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
14 Apr 193962.3DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Josef Mutschlechner
Father Josef Mutschlechner (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMühlen

  • a priest for 38.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018