Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Francesco Muti

Deceased

Bishop of Città della Pieve, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1647¹Born
22 Feb 167225.1AppointedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy
6 Mar 167225.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 171063.7DiedBishop of Città della Pieve, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Muti
Bishop Carlo Francesco Muti (born 1647, died ) Bishop of Città della Pieve

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 38.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 160
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast