Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Antoine Muscella, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalý, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Matteo de Saint Etienne)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1652Born
25 Sep 170250.1AppointedBishop of Cefalý, Italy
1 Oct 170250.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalý, Italy
22 Jun 171663.8DiedBishop of Cefalý, Italy

MicroData Summary for Joseph Antoine Muscella
Bishop Joseph Antoine Muscella O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cefalý

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Etienne
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Ara Coeli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 13.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 155
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1702, Number 21
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast