Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominique Edward Murphy

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹Born
14 Sep 171564.7AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
18 Dec 171564.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
24 Aug 172473.6SelectedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
1 Sep 172473.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
22 Dec 172877.9DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominique Edward Murphy:
Archbishop Dominique Edward Murphy (born 1651, died ) Archbishop of Dublin

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 189, and Page 232
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 27 Jul 2015