Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Angelus (Josef) Münzloher, S.D.S. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Assam, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1866Born
14 Oct 188620.4ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Savior
21 Dec 188923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Savior
189023.6AppointedPrefect of Assam, India
190639.6ResignedPrefect of Assam, India
16 Aug 195791.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Assam, India

MicroData Summary for Angelus (Josef) Münzloher
Father Angelus (Josef) Münzloher S.D.S. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Assam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTuafkirchen a Vils, Germany

  • a priest for 67.6 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018